EP1463897 - SPIRAL FOR INTERCONNECTING ENDS OF ENDLESS BELT SEGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corriveau, André Fedia Bramble Garlands, Triq Wied Ghollieqa, Kappara Malta SGN08 / MT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Corriveau, André Fedia Bramble Garlands, Triq Wied Ghollieqa, Kappara Malta SGN08 / MT | ||
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Lippert Pintlepin Mfg. Inc. 6410, Fontaine Rock Forest, Québec J1N 2S6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORRIVEAU, André Fedia Bramble Garlands, Triq Wied Ghollieqa Kappara, Malta SGN08 / MT | 02 /
CRETE, Sylvain 20 Principale Sawyerville, Québec J0B 3A0 / CA | 03 /
FRASER, Caroline 65, rue de London Sherbrooke, Québec J1H 3M4 / CA | 04 /
PLANTE, Jean-Sébastien 477, Bouchette Sherbrooke, Québec J1J 2T2 / CA | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2004/41] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01275043.6 | 10.12.2001 | [2004/41] | WO2001CA01784 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03054416 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1463897 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16G3/02 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
F16G3/02 (EP);
D21F1/0054 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIRALE ZUM MITEINANDERVERBINDEN DER ENDEN VON ENDLOSRIEMENSEGMENTEN | [2004/41] | English: | SPIRAL FOR INTERCONNECTING ENDS OF ENDLESS BELT SEGMENTS | [2004/41] | French: | SPIRALE PERMETTANT DE RACCORDER LES EXTREMITES DES SEGMENTS D'UNE COURROIE SANS FIN | [2004/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/19] | 02.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO0196761 (LIPPERT PINTLEPIN MFG INC [CA]) [E] 1,2,4,5,7,8,11,12 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 34; figures 1-4 *; | [XDAY]US4539730 (ROMANSKI ERIC R [US]) [XD] 1,2,4,7-9,11,14 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 49; figures 1-5 * [A] 6,7 [Y] 15,16; | [XA]EP0364066 (ASTEN GROUP [US]) [X] 1,15,16 * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 28; figures 1-8 * [A] 5; | [XDA]EP0674041 (ASTEN INC [US]) [XD] 1 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 13; figures 1-4 * [A] 15,16; | [XDA]DE2059021 (OPTI HOLDING AG) [XD] 1,2,4 * page 6, line 1 - line 28; figures 1-3 * [A] 15,16; | [YD]US4791708 (SMOLENS H DANA [US]) [YD] 15,16 * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 7; figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0967306 (JOHNS MANVILLE INT INC [US]) [A] 11-13 * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 2, lines 39-42 * * page 5, line 19 - line 20 *; | [AD]EP0275656 (SCAPA PORRITT LTD [GB]); | [AD]US5915422 (FAGERHOLM LARS [FI]) | by applicant | US5915422 | US4539730 | US4791708 | EP0275656 | EP0674041 | DE2059021 |