EP1142608 - System and method for prevention of recurrent vasovagal syncope using cardiac pacing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACESETTER, INC. 15900 Valley View Court Sylmar, CA 91392-9221 / US | [2001/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Euljoon 25830 London Place Stevenson Ranch, CA 91381 / US | 02 /
Kadish, Alan H. 1317 Eskin Drive Northbrook, IL 60062 / US | 03 /
Falkenberg, Eric 2820 Royal Hills Court Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al KILBURN & STRODE, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01300732.3 | 29.01.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | US20000543832 | 05.04.2000 Original published format: US 543832 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1142608 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/368 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
A61N1/368 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Vorbeugung eines wiederkehrenden vasoneurotischen Kollapses unter Verwendung von Herzstimulation | [2001/41] | English: | System and method for prevention of recurrent vasovagal syncope using cardiac pacing | [2001/41] | French: | Procédé et système de prévention d'une syncope vaso-vagale récurrente utilisant la stimulation cardiaque | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US5466254 | US5800467 | US5480412 | US5139020 | US19980001968 |