EP1143694 - Image capture and processing accessory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symagery Microsystems Inc. 3026 Solandt Road Ottawa Ontario K2K 2A5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Symagery Microsystems Inc. 3026 Solandt Road Ottawa, Ontario K2K 2A5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roustaei, Alex 2454 Rue Denise La Jolla, California 92037 / US | 02 /
Farmilo, William 3800 Twin Elm Road Ottawa Ontario K0A 2Z0 / CA | 03 /
McLean, Michael 83 Marlborough Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1N 8E8 / CA | [2001/48] |
Former [2001/41] | 01 /
Roustaei, Alex 2454 Rue Denise La Jolla, California 92037 / US | ||
02 /
Farmilo, William 3-258 Ste. Cecile Street Vanier, Ontario K1L 5K8 / CA | |||
03 /
McLean, Michael 83 Marlborough Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1N 8E8 / CA | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire, AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Maury, Richard Philip Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302859.2 | 27.03.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | US20000192281P | 27.03.2000 Original published format: US 192281 P | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143694 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1143694 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, G06F3/00, H04N1/333, G06F17/30, G06K17/00, H04L12/28 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
H04N1/00307 (EP,US);
H04N1/00281 (EP,US);
H04N1/00299 (EP,US);
H04N1/00326 (EP,US);
H04N1/00334 (EP,US);
H04N1/33353 (EP,US);
H04N1/00283 (EP,US);
H04N2201/007 (EP,US);
H04N2201/33357 (EP,US);
H04N2201/33378 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/41] | H04N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildaufnahme- und Verarbeitungsgerät | [2001/41] | English: | Image capture and processing accessory | [2001/41] | French: | Appareil de capture et traitement d'images | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/16] | 10.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9409595 (SHAW VENSON M [US], et al) [X] 2,4,5,7-11,19,21,22,24-29,36,37,39-41,44-58,60 * page 7, line 20 - line 24 * * page 23, line 9 * * page 11, line 6 - line 8 * * page 12, paragraph 3 * * page 34 * * page 8, line 3 - line 12 * * page 9, lines 11-16 * * figures 2,4,5 * * claim 16 * * page 11, line 8 - line 23 * * page 15, line 6 - line 8 * * page 24, line 18 - line 20 * * page 29, line 16 - line 19 * [Y] 1,3,6,12-18,20,23,30-35,38,42,43,59; | [Y]EP0951174 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1,3,16,20 * column 4, line 3 - line 8 *; | [Y]WO9850814 (ROUSTAEI ALEXANDER R [US]) [Y] 1,6,15,16,23,35,38,42,43 * page 21, line 22 - line 23 * * page 10, line 30 - line 34 * * page 24, line 11 - line 12; claim 15 *; | [Y]EP0977141 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 12-14,30,31 * column 8, line 48 - line 50; figure 3 * * column 8, line 36 *; | [Y]EP0837406 (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 17,18,32,34,59 * page 8, line 1 - line 5 * * page 26, line 4 - line 8; figure 3B * * page 18, line 15 - line 22; figure 12 * * page 18, line 24; figure 5 *; | [Y]EP0807879 (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 33 * figure 8; claim 15 * |