|
03.07.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
03.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2007 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.2007 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.09.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Description |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Description |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2006 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2006 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2006 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.07.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.01.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2003 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2003 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |