blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1270678

EP1270678 - Fiber reactive dyestuffs [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.05.2009
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 30.10.2013  [2013/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Everlight USA, Inc.
10570 Southern Loop Boulevard
Pineville, NC 26134 / US
[2003/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Hwang, Huei Ching
6 F, No. 18, Lane 69, Tung-Yung St.
TaYung Li, Ba Te City, Taoyuan Hsien / TW
02 / Chen, Keh Loong
4 F, No. 135, Chi-Lin Rd.
YangChou Village, LuChu, Taoyuan Hsien / TW
03 / Hsu, Mao Cheng
7 F, No. 6-7, Alley 300, Guang-Tai Rd.
SongWu, Pin Zhen City, Taoyuan Hsien / TW
04 / Yin, Ta-Chung
2 F, No. 4, Lane 7, Alley 22, Section 2
Sing-Lon Rd., Wen Shan, Taipei City / TW
 [2003/22]
Former [2003/01]01 / Huang, Huei Ching
6 F, No. 18, Lane 69, Tung-Yung St.
TaYung Li, Ba Te City, Taoyuan Hsien / TW
02 / Chen, Keh Loong
4 F, No. 135, Chi-Lin Rd.
YangChou Village, LuChu, Taoyuan Hsien / TW
03 / Hsu, Mao Cheng
7 F, No. 6-7, Alley 300, Guang-Tai Rd.
SongWu, Pin Zhen City, Taoyuan Hsien / TW
04 / Yin, Ta-Chung
2 F, No. 4, Lane 7, Alley 22, Section 2
Sing-Lon Rd., Wen Shan, Taipei City / TW
Representative(s)Johnson, Yvonne Catherine
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham
B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/25]Johnson, Yvonne Catherine
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Former [2003/01]Stonehouse, Sidney William
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date01305405.121.06.2001
[2003/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1270678
Date:02.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1270678
Date:09.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2001
ClassificationIPC:C09B62/04, C09B62/503
[2003/01]
CPC:
C09B62/04 (EP,US); C09B62/4403 (EP,US); C09B62/503 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/01]
TitleGerman:Faserreaktive Farbstoffe[2007/48]
English:Fiber reactive dyestuffs[2003/01]
French:Colorants réactifs sur la fibre[2003/01]
Former [2003/01]Fasereaktive Farbstoffe
Examination procedure12.07.2001Examination requested  [2003/01]
10.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.09.2007
14.09.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
25.09.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2008Fee for grant paid
06.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.05.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)14.04.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
06.05.2008Request for further processing filed
06.05.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.06.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
11.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
CY09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
TR09.07.2008
SE09.10.2008
[2013/44]
Former [2011/44]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
CY09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
SE09.10.2008
Former [2010/09]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
SE09.10.2008
Former [2009/19]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
Former [2009/15]AT09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
Former [2009/12]FI09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
Documents cited:Search[DY]US4703112  (MISCHKE PETER [DE], et al) [DY] 1-23,25-27,29 * example -; claim - *;
 [DY]US5484899  (DEITZ ROLF [CH], et al) [DY] 1-23,25-27,29* example -; claim - *;
 [XY]US6222067  (CHEN KEH-LOONG [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,9,17,19-21,24,28 * Application Examples 1,2 *; column 1, line 10 - line 44 * [Y] 1-23,25-27,29
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.