EP1179398 - Cutter for plastic strap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County Illinois 60025 / US | ||
Former [2002/07] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mothena, Mark 6 Aberdeen Road Hawthorn Woods, Illinois 60047 / US | 02 /
Figiel, Janusz 21286 W. Lakeview Parkway Mundelein, Illinois 60060 / US | [2002/07] | Representative(s) | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2002/07] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305518.1 | 26.06.2001 | [2002/07] | Priority number, date | US20000613316 | 11.07.2000 Original published format: US 613316 | [2002/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1179398 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1179398 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1179398 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B26B27/00, B65B69/00 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
B26B27/00 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S83/909 (EP,US);
Y10T83/662 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9493 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/07] | B26B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/07] | Title | German: | Schneidevorrichtung für Kunststoffband | [2002/08] | English: | Cutter for plastic strap | [2002/07] | French: | Dispositif de coupe pour ruban en matière plastique | [2002/07] |
Former [2002/07] | Schneidvorrichtung für Kunststoffband | Examination procedure | 09.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 21.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.2005 | BE | 24.08.2005 | CH | 24.08.2005 | CY | 24.08.2005 | FI | 24.08.2005 | FR | 24.08.2005 | IT | 24.08.2005 | LI | 24.08.2005 | NL | 24.08.2005 | TR | 24.08.2005 | DK | 24.11.2005 | GR | 24.11.2005 | SE | 24.11.2005 | ES | 05.12.2005 | PT | 24.01.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
IT | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
TR | 24.08.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
ES | 05.12.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
IT | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
ES | 05.12.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
ES | 05.12.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
ES | 05.12.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
ES | 05.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2581915 (RUYTER JACKIE DE [FR]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 16 - page 4, line 13; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4644646 (LADIN ELI M [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]US4831734 (DE RUYTER JACKIE A [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 5 - line 61; figures 1-5 * |