EP1178403 - Download system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uchida, Kazuyuki 2-7-14-1302 Chuo, Joto-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 536-0005 / JP | 02 /
Yasutake, Koichi 3-6, Kotari Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-0833 / JP | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306589.1 | 01.08.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | JP20000233461 | 01.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000233461 | JP20000282761 | 19.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000282761 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1178403 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1178403 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
G06F9/445 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/16] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Herunterladungssystem | [2002/06] | English: | Download system | [2002/06] | French: | Système de téléchargement | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/44] | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.03.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.03.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.03.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.03.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.03.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]NL8902501 (OCE NEDERLAND BV) [X] 1-17 * claims 1-9 * * the whole document *; | [A]US6026366 (GRUBE GARY W [US]) [A] 1-4,8,9,13,14 * abstract * |