EP1188777 - Modified polyolefin and resin composition containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6070 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6070 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ota, Seiji c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Yoshii, Kouji c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba / JP | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2002/12] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307944.7 | 18.09.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | JP20000284153 | 19.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000284153 | JP20010072987 | 14.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001072987 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1188777 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Classification | IPC: | C08F255/02, C09J151/06, // (C08F255/02, 220:32) | [2002/12] | CPC: |
C09J151/06 (EP,US);
C08F255/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F255/00 (EP,US);
C08F255/08 (EP,US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US);
C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/06, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L51/06, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C09J151/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09J151/06, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Modifiziertes Polyolefin und dieses enthaltende Harzzusammensetzung | [2002/12] | English: | Modified polyolefin and resin composition containing the same | [2002/12] | French: | Polyoléfine modifiée et composition de résine contenant celle-ci | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/42] | 13.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |