EP1193972 - A projector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Hirohisa c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Nobuo c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Haruyoshi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2011/52] |
Former [2002/14] | 01 /
Nakano, Hirohisa c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
Watanabe, Nobuo c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
Yamada, Haruyoshi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2011/52] |
Former [2002/14] | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308218.5 | 27.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | JP20000294686 | 27.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000294686 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1193972 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193972 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/74 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
H04N9/3141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/01] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Projektor | [2002/14] | English: | A projector | [2002/14] | French: | Projecteur | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2009 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 04.06.2009 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 21.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0829750 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,5 * column W *; | [A]US6111630 (WATANUKI KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 11 - line 61 *; | [A]US5669688 (BAAR KENNETH W [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 14 *; | [A]EP0866359 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5 * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 18 * * page 11, line 46 - page 13, line 55 *; | [A]EP0773691 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5 * column W *; | [PY]EP1102117 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PY] 1,5 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 4 * * column 8, line 17 - line 45 * * column 9, line 37 - column 11, line 31 * |