EP1235181 - Improvements relating to document capture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pilu, Maurizio 103 Northville Road Bristol BS7 0RJ / GB | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Richard Anthony, et al Hewlett-Packard Limited, IP Section, Building 3, Filton Road Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Lawrence, Richard Anthony, et al Hewlett-Packard Limited, IP Section, Building 3, Filton Road Stoke Gifford, Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310728.9 | 20.12.2001 | [2002/35] | Priority number, date | GB20010004664 | 23.02.2001 Original published format: GB 0104664 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1235181 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1235181 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/00, H04N1/387 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
H04N1/387 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbesserungen für Dokumentenaufnahmen | [2002/35] | English: | Improvements relating to document capture | [2002/35] | French: | Améliorations pour capture d'images | [2002/35] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 03.05.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5764383 (SAUND ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 1,15 *; | [X] - CLARK P ET AL, "Location and recovery of text on oriented surfaces", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (2000), vol. 3967, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 267 - 277, XP002264506 [X] 1-20 * sections 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.373502 | [X] - LIEBOWITZ D ET AL, "Metric rectification for perspective images of planes", COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, 1998. PROCEEDINGS. 1998 IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON SANTA BARBARA, CA, USA 23-25 JUNE 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19980623), ISBN 0-8186-8497-6, pages 482 - 488, XP010291688 [X] 1-20 * sections 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.1998.698649 | [A] - HORAUD R. AND MONFGA O., vision par ordinateur, PARIS, FRANCE0, HERMES, (1993), 020709, XP002343337 [A] 1-20 * pages 131-156 * | [PA] - DANCE C R, "Perspective estimation for document images", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (2001), vol. 4670, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 244 - 254, XP002264501 [PA] 1-20 * whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.450733 | [PA] - CLARK P ET AL, "Estimating the Orientation and Recovery of Text Planes in a Single Image", PROCEEDINGS OF THE BRITISH MACHINE VISION CONFERENCE, (20010910), pages 421 - 430, XP002314536 [PA] 1-20 * whole document * |