EP1195858 - Device for duct with cable fastening means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Legrand France 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | For all designated states Legrand SNC 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre-de-Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states LEGRAND FRANCE 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | ||
For all designated states LEGRAND SNC 128, Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | |||
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states LEGRAND 128 Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | ||
For all designated states LEGRAND SNC 128, Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | |||
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states LEGRAND 128 Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny F-87000 Limoges / FR | ||
For all designated states LEGRAND SNC 128, Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny F-87000 Limoges / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guillon, Xavier 140, boulevard Carnot 72000 Le Mans / FR | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2002/15] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01402485.5 | 27.09.2001 | [2002/15] | Priority number, date | FR20000012738 | 05.10.2000 Original published format: FR 0012738 | [2002/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1195858 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1195858 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01R24/06 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
H01R24/76 (EP);
H02G3/105 (EP);
H02G3/14 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [2003/01] |
Former [2002/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Führungskanal-Einrichtung mit Kabelbefestigung | [2002/15] | English: | Device for duct with cable fastening means | [2002/15] | French: | Appareillage pour goulotte à dispositif serre-câble | [2002/15] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 30.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 28.06.2006 | SE | 28.09.2006 | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/36] | GB | 28.06.2006 | |
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | GB | 28.06.2006 | |
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 28.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB191513 (JOHN FRANCIS WATSON, et al); | [A]DE3909236 (BOLDT WILFRIED [DE], et al); | [A]US6086390 (HAUT DAVID [US]) |