EP1217867 - Optical cross connect for arbitrary switching of communication signals from different multiplex planes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2002/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beisel, Werner Erlenweg 8 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | 02 /
Wettengel, Heinz Bergstrasse 18 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 03 /
Hägele, Volker, Dr. Stettiner Strasse 40 71384 Schorndorf / DE | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Urlichs, Stefan, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Urlichs, Stefan, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2002/26] | Urlichs, Stefan, Dipl.-Phys., et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department 70430 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01440413.1 | 10.12.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | DE2000165000 | 23.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10065000 | [2002/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1217867 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1217867 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04Q11/00 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0005 (EP,US);
H04J2203/0005 (EP,US);
H04J2203/0014 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0024 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/26] | Title | German: | Optischer Crossconnect zum wahlfreien Verschalten von Nachrichtensignalen unterschiedlicher Multiplexebenen | [2002/26] | English: | Optical cross connect for arbitrary switching of communication signals from different multiplex planes | [2002/26] | French: | Dispositif de brassage pour commutation arbitraire des signaux de communication entre des planes de multiplexage différentes | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/27] | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.11.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3501674 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * figure 3 * * page 15, line 20 - page 16, line 29 *; | [X]EP0368501 (STC PLC [GB]) [X] 1-7 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 25 - line 38 *; | [A]GB2287857 (PLESSEY TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1193995 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [E] 1-7 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0014] *; | [A] - HARADA K ET AL, "Hierarchical Optical Path Cross-Connect Systems for Large Scale WDM Networks", OFC/IOOC '99 OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE / INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTEGRATED OPTICS AND OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION. SAN DIEGO, CA, FEB. 21 - 26, 1999, OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE / INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTEGRATED OP, (19990221), ISBN 0-7803-5430-3, pages 356 - 358, XP002175854 [A] 1-7 * figures 2,3 * * page 357 * | [A] - "T1M1.3/2000-123. Draft Version 0.7.0 of ITU-T Recommendation G.709", ITU, (20000807), XP002150710 [A] 5 * page 17, paragraph 7.2 * |