EP1261431 - APPARATUS FOR GRINDING OF PARTICULATE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/49] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GRINDING OF PARTICULATE MATERIAL | ||
[2008/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.L. Smidth & Co. A/S 77 Vigerslev Allé DK-2500 Valby Copenhagen / DK | [2008/23] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states F.L. Smidth & Co. A/S 77 Vigerslev Allé DK-2500 Valby, Copenhagen / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOUBORG, Jörn Engholmsparken 8 DK-4000 Roskilde / DK | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Johansson, Lars-Erik, et al Hynell Intellectual Property AB Hammarbybacken 27 120 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Johansson, Lars-Erik, et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors / Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/51] | Johansson, Lars E., et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls Väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/49] | Hynell, Magnus Hynell Patenttjänst AB, Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 01900219.5 | 19.01.2001 | [2002/49] | WO2001IB00057 | Priority number, date | DK20000000147 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: DK 200000147 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0154818 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1261431 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1261431 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B02C4/02, B02C4/28 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
B02C4/286 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZERKLEINERUNG VON KÖRNIGEM MATERIAL | [2008/09] | English: | APPARATUS FOR GRINDING OF PARTICULATE MATERIAL | [2008/09] | French: | APPAREIL DE BROYAGE D'UNE SUBSTANCE PARTICULAIRE | [2008/09] |
Former [2002/49] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZERKLEINERUNG VON KÖRNIGEM MATERIAL | ||
Former [2002/49] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GRINDING OF PARTICULATE MATERIAL | ||
Former [2002/49] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE BROYAGE D'UNE SUBSTANCE PARTICULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 31.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 15.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.2008 | BE | 04.06.2008 | CY | 04.06.2008 | FI | 04.06.2008 | NL | 04.06.2008 | TR | 04.06.2008 | SE | 04.09.2008 | IE | 19.01.2009 | LU | 19.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IE | 19.01.2009 | ||
LU | 19.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IE | 19.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB963088 (POLSKA AKADEMIA NAUK INST BADA) |