EP1262476 - PROCESSES FOR PREPARING QUINOLINE DERIVATIVES AND INTERMEDIATES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 7-1, Kanda-Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | [2006/13] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-City, Okayama 710-8622 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 7-1, Kandanishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TATSUTA, Kuniaki 2-26-7, Matsunoki Suginami-ku, Tokyo 166-0014 / JP | 02 /
KIKUYAMA, Shigeki c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 2-28, Kurashiki-cho, Nakajo-machi Kitakanbara-gun, Niigata 959-2691 / JP | 03 /
TAMAI, Yoshin c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 2-28, Kurashiki-cho, Nakajo-machi Kitakanbara-gun, Niigata 959-2691 / JP | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01904553.3 | 19.02.2001 | [2002/49] | WO2001JP01184 | Priority number, date | JP20000042594 | 21.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000042594 | JP20000042595 | 21.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000042595 | [2002/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0160800 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1262476 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1262476 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/14 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
C07D215/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON QUINOLIN-DERIVATEN UND IHRE ZWISCHENSTUFEN | [2002/49] | English: | PROCESSES FOR PREPARING QUINOLINE DERIVATIVES AND INTERMEDIATES THEREOF | [2002/49] | French: | PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE DERIVES DE QUINOLINE ET DE LEURS INTERMEDIAIRES | [2002/49] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2002 | Translation filed | 05.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2007 | BE | 10.01.2007 | CY | 10.01.2007 | DK | 10.01.2007 | FI | 10.01.2007 | IT | 10.01.2007 | NL | 10.01.2007 | TR | 10.01.2007 | LU | 19.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | SE | 10.04.2007 | GR | 11.04.2007 | ES | 21.04.2007 | PT | 11.06.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CY | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
LU | 19.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CY | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 10.01.2007 | |
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 10.01.2007 | |
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 10.01.2007 | |
PT | 11.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0005213 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [YX]EP0535548 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * see page 7/8 * [X] 4-6 | [Y] - SUZUKI M ET AL, "First Systematic Chiral Syntheses of Two Pairs of Enantiomers with 3,5-dihydroxyheptenoic Acid Chain, Associated with a Potent Synthetic Statin NK-104", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (19991018), vol. 9, no. 20, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2977 - 2982, XP004180521 [Y] 1-3 * see scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00519-3 | International search | [Y]US5856336 (FUJIKAWA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y] - SPRANGLER CHARLES W. ET AL., "Preparation of conjugated aromatic polyenals by wittig oxopropenylation", SYNTH. COMMUN., (1988), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 51 - 59, XP002942056 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00397918808057819 | [Y] - YAMAMOTO KOJI ET AL., "A synthesis of a doubly-bridged (24) annulene", TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1986), vol. 27, no. 8, pages 975 - 976, XP002942057 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)84152-0 | [Y] - MARKL GOTTFRIED ET AL., "Synthesis of diepoxy(16)annulene(6.2) by intramolecular McMurry coupling", TETRAHEDRON, (1999), vol. 55, no. 47, pages 13407 - 13416, XP002942058 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(99)00825-X | [Y] - CHA JIN SOON ET AL., "Exceptionally facile reduction of carboxylic esters to aldehydes by lithium aluminum hydride in the presence of diethylamine", J. ORG. CHEM., (1987), vol. 52, no. 24, pages 5486 - 5487, XP002942059 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00233a040 |