EP1255852 - IMMUNOASSAY AND DIAGNOSTIC REAGENT FOR MALARIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem Investment, Ltd 20, Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-ku Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2008/28] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states LG Chem Investment, Ltd LG Twin Towers, 20, Youido-dong, Yongdungpo-ku Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, Kook-Jin Eunbitmaeul 521-1807, 870 Hwajong-dong, Deokyang-ku Koyang-si, Kyungki-do 412-270 / KR | 02 /
SHON, Mi-Jin Hanbit Apt. 125-505, 99 Eoeun-dong, Yoosung-ku Daejeon-si 305-755 / KR | 03 /
YOO, Seung-Bum Hanuri Apt. 104-601, 763, Tanbang-dong, Seo-ku Daejeon-si 302-768 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Sang-Ik Narae Apt. 104-1303, 462-4 Jeonmin-dong, Yoosung-ku Daejeon-si 305-811 / KR | 05 /
OH, Jae-Hoon Chungsol Apt. 102-306, 8-2 Songang-dong, Yoosung-ku Daejeon-si 305-752 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Seung-Won Limaechon 206-1804, 124, Limae-dong, Bundang-ku Sungnam-si, Kyungki-do 463-830 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Hyung-Cheol 37, 266 Jungreung-dong, Sungbuk-ku Seoul 136-100 / KR | [2008/28] |
Former [2002/46] | 01 /
LIM, Kook-Jin Eunbitmaeul 521-1807, 870 Hwajongdong, Deokyang-ku Koyang-si, Kyungki-do 412-270 / KR | ||
02 /
SHON, Mi-Jin Hanbit Apt. 125-505, 99 Eoeun-dong, Yoosung-ku Daejeon-si 305-755 / KR | |||
03 /
YOO, Seung-Bum Hanuri Apt. 104-601, 763, Tanbang-dong, Seo-ku Daejeon-si 302-768 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Sang-Ik Narae Apt. 104-1303, 462-4 Jeonmindong, Yoosung-ku Daejeon-si 305-811 / KR | |||
05 /
OH, Jae-Hoon Chungsol Apt. 102-306, 8-2 Songangdong, Yoosung-ku Daejeon-si 305-752 / KR | |||
06 /
LEE, Seung-Won Limaechon 206-1804, 124, Limae-dong, Bundang-ku Sungnam-si, Kyungki-do 463-830 / KR | |||
07 /
KIM, Hyung-Cheol 37, 266 Jungreung-dong, Sungbuk-ku Seoul 136-100 / KR | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01908398.9 | 15.02.2001 | [2002/46] | WO2001KR00229 | Priority number, date | KR20000007648 | 17.02.2000 Original published format: KR 2000007648 | KR20000007649 | 17.02.2000 Original published format: KR 2000007649 | KR20000007650 | 17.02.2000 Original published format: KR 2000007650 | KR20000012172 | 10.03.2000 Original published format: KR 2000012172 | KR20000045806 | 08.08.2000 Original published format: KR 2000045806 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0161032 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255852 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1255852 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1255852 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/04, G01N33/53, C12N15/00 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
G01N33/56905 (EP,US);
A61P33/06 (EP);
C07K14/445 (EP,US);
G01N2333/445 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMMUNOASSAY UND DIAGNOSTISCHES REAGENZ FÜR MALARIA | [2002/46] | English: | IMMUNOASSAY AND DIAGNOSTIC REAGENT FOR MALARIA | [2002/46] | French: | REACTIF DE DOSAGE IMMUNOLOGIQUE ET DE DIAGNOSTIC POUR LE PALUDISME | [2002/46] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 08.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.12.2008 | BE | 10.12.2008 | CY | 10.12.2008 | DK | 10.12.2008 | FI | 10.12.2008 | IT | 10.12.2008 | NL | 10.12.2008 | TR | 10.12.2008 | IE | 15.02.2009 | LU | 15.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | FR | 02.03.2009 | GB | 10.03.2009 | SE | 10.03.2009 | GR | 11.03.2009 | ES | 21.03.2009 | PT | 11.05.2009 | DE | 01.09.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 15.02.2009 | ||
LU | 15.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
GB | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 15.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
GB | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 15.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
GB | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 15.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
GB | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 15.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 15.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 15.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/33] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 10.12.2008 | |
NL | 10.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SOARES I S ET AL, "LONGEVITY OF NATURALLY ACQUIRED ANTIBODY RESPONSES TO THE N- AND C-TERMINAL REGIONS OF PLASMODIUM VIVAX MEROZOITE SURFACE PROTEIN 1", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF TROPICAL MEDICINE & HYGIENE, LAWRENCE, KS, US, (1999), vol. 60, no. 3, ISSN 0002-9637, pages 357 - 363, XP009028883 [X] 1-15,17,21-35,57,58,60 * abstract * * page 357, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 358, column 1, paragraphs 2,3 * * figures 3,4 * | [X] - TYAGI P ET AL, "NATURALLY OCCURRING PLASMODIA-SPECIFIC CIRCULATING IMMUNE COMPLEXES IN INDIVIDUALS OF MALARIA ENDEMIC AREAS IN INDIA", INDIAN JOURNAL OF MALARIOLOGY, MALARIA RESEARCH CENTER, DEHLI, IN, (199903), vol. 36, no. 1/2, pages 12 - 18, XP009028923 [X] 1-7,13,15,16,21-23,29,31-34 * abstract * * page 13, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 14, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 15, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 16, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 17, column 1, paragraph 1 * | [X] - RAY K ET AL, "EVALUATION OF INDIRECT IMMUNOFLUORESCENT ANTIBODY TEST FOR DETECTION OF IGM SPECIFIC ANTIBODIES IN MALARIA", JOURNAL OF COMMUNICABLE DISEASES, INDIA SOCIETY FOR MALARIA AND OTHER COMMUNICABLE DISEASES, DEL, IN, (199206), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 0019-5138, pages 82 - 86, XP009028938 [X] 1-7,13,15,21-23,29,31-34 * abstract * * page 82, paragraph 1 - page 83, paragraph 4 * * tables 1,2 * * page 85, paragraphs 3-5 * | [XY] - GIBSON H L ET AL, "STRUCTURE AND EXPRESSION OF THE GENE FOR PV200 A MAJOR BLOOD-STAGE SURFACE ANTIGEN OF PLASMODIUM-VIVAX", MOLECULAR AND BIOCHEMICAL PARASITOLOGY, (1992), vol. 50, no. 2, ISSN 0166-6851, pages 325 - 334, XP000199300 [X] 47-50 * abstract * * page 326, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 327, column 2, paragraph 1 * [Y] 41-46 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0166-6851(92)90230-H | [XY] - GENTZ R ET AL, "MAJOR SURFACE ANTIGEN P190 OF PLASMODIUM FALCIPARUM: DETECTION OF COMMON EPITOPES PRESENT IN A VARIETY OF PLASMODIA ISOLATES", EMBO JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1988), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 225 - 230, XP002057622 [X] 57-60 * abstract * * page 226, column 2, paragraph 3 * [Y] 41-46 | International search | [Y]WO9726911 (UNIV GEORGETOWN [US], et al); | [Y]WO9730158 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al); | [Y] - SOARES ET AL., "Acquired immune responses to the N- and C-terminal regions of plasmodium vivax merozoite surface protein 1 in individuals exposed to malaria", INFECT. IMMUN., (1997), vol. 65, pages 1606 - 1614, XP002972558 | [Y] - PAN ET AL, "Vaccine candidate MSP-1 from plasmodium falciparum: a redesigned 4917 bp polynucleotide enables synthesis and isolation of full-length protein from escherichia coli and mammalian cells", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (19990215), vol. 27, pages 1094 - 1103, XP000953100 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/27.4.1094 | [Y] - FRUH ET AL, "A new tool for the serodiagnosis of acute plasmodium falciparum malaria in individuals with promary infection", J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (19890815), vol. 122, pages 25 - 32, XP002972559 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(89)90330-X | [Y] - SANCHEZ ET AL, "Antibody response to plasmodium vivax antigens in human malaria", AM. J. TROP. MED. HYG., (199403), vol. 50, pages 329 - 338, XP002973046 | [Y] - SOARES ET AL, "Antibody response to the N and C-terminal regions of the plasmodium vivax merozoite surface protein 1 in individuals living in an area of exclusive transmission of P. vivax malaria in the north of Brazil", ACTA TROP., (19990115), vol. 72, pages 13 - 24, XP002972552 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0001-706X(98)00078-3 | [Y] - MAIER ET AL, "Serodiagnosis of malaria. Plasmodium berghei and P. falciparum as antigen for the indirect immune of fluorescence test", IMMUN. INFECT., (197906), vol. 7, pages 75 - 82, XP002973070 | [Y] - KASLOW ET AL, "Expression and immunogenicity of the C-terminus of a major blood-stage surface protein of plasmodium vivax, Pv200(19), secreted from saccharomyces cerevisiae", IMMUNOL. LETT., (199607), vol. 51, pages 187 - 189, XP002972560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-2478(96)02570-9 | [Y] - KASLOW ET AL, "Expression and antigenicity of plasmodium falciparum major merozoite surface protein (MSP1(19)) variants secreted from saccharomyces cerevisiae", MOL. BIOCHEM. PARASITOL., (1994), vol. 63, pages 283 - 289, XP000603953 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0166-6851(94)90064-7 | [Y] - DELCARDAYRE ET AL, "Engineering ribonucleas A: production, purification and characterization of wild-type enzyme and mutants at G1n11", PROTEIN ENG., (1995), vol. 8, pages 261 - 273, XP002972561 | [Y] - WITZGALL ET AL, "A mammalian expression vector for the expression of GAL4 fusion proteins with an epitope tag and histidine tail", ANAL. BIOMCHEM., (1994), vol. 223, pages 291 - 298, XP002972562 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1994.1587 | [Y] - GENBANK, Database accession no. AAC37236, XP002972501 | [Y] - HUW DAVIES, Introductory immunology, CHAPMAN & HALL, (1997), pages 381 - 383, XP008041000 [Y] * page 381, column 383 * | [T] - PARK ET AL, "Naturally acquired antibody responses to the C-terminal region of merozoite surface protein 1 of plasmodium vivax in Korea", CLIN. DIAGN. LAB. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 8, pages 14 - 20, XP002972563 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CDLI.8.1.14-20.2001 | by applicant | - ELLINGER ET AL., VIROL., (1991), vol. 180, page 81 | - MARCZINOVITS ET AL., J. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 31, page 225 | - CHANG ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1985), vol. 3, pages 985 - 990 | - ELLINGER ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1991), vol. 180, pages 811 - 813 | - SOARES ET AL., AMERICAN JOURNAL OF TROPICAL MEDICINE & HYGIENE, (1999), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 357 - 363 | - TYAGI P. ET AL., INDIAN JOURNAL OF MALARIOLOGY, (199903), vol. 36, no. Y2, pages 12 - 18 | - RAY K. ET AL., JOURNAL OF COMMUNICABLE DISEASES, (199206), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 82 - 86 | - GIBSON ET AL., MOLECULAR AND BIOCHEMICAL PARASITOLOGY, (1992), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 325 - 334 | - KASLOW ET AL., IMMUNOL. LETT., (199607), vol. 51, pages 187 - 189 | - GENTZ R. ET AL., EMBO JOURNAL, (1988), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 225 - 230 |