EP1259980 - TWO ETCHANT ETCH METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. P.O. Box 450A Santa Clara, California 95052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. P.O. Box 450A Santa Clara, California 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHAN, Anisul 125 Connemare Way 81 Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Ajay 510 Kenilworth Court Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 03 /
CHINN, Jeffrey, D. 605 St. Croix Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 04 /
PODLESNIK, Dragan 1736 Oak Creek Drive Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01913007.9 | 22.02.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001US05949 | Priority number, date | US20000513552 | 25.02.2000 Original published format: US 513552 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0163657 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259980 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/3065 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
H01L21/30655 (EP,US);
B81C1/00571 (EP,US);
H01L21/3065 (EP,US);
H01L21/32137 (EP,US);
B81B2203/033 (EP,US);
B81C2201/0132 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AETZVERFAHREN MIT ZWEI AETZMITTELN | [2002/48] | English: | TWO ETCHANT ETCH METHOD | [2002/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE GRAVURE A DEUX AGENTS DE GRAVURE | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 31.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/10] | 05.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0004213 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * figures 4-6,8 * * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 25 * * page 12, line 23 - page 34, line 9 * [Y] 9-13; | [Y]GB2333267 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 9-13 * figures 4,5 * * page 3, line 7 - line 29 * * page 5, line 25 - page 9, line 9 *; | [XA]EP0746015 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figure 5 * * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 3 * [A] 4,7-13; | [A]JPH0845907 | [A] - PINTO R ET AL, "reactive ion etching in SF6 gas mixtures", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY,ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE,US, (198701), vol. 134, no. 1, ISSN 0013-4651, pages 165 - 175, XP002135036 [A] 7,8 * figures 1,6-9 * * paragraph [RESULTS] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, & JP08045907 A 19960216 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |