|
14.03.2011 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Confirmation of the correction of a decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Communication regarding the forthcoming grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2009 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
19.06.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
29.05.2007 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2007 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2007 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.05.2007 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
15.03.2007 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.10.2006 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2002 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2002 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
17.10.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.07.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.09.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.09.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
13.09.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2001 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
03.04.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.04.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.04.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
03.04.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |