EP1261501 - PRODUCT COMPRISING A SENSOR AND A SURFACE WAVE ELEMENT, AND METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING, FROM THE SENSOR, A MEASURED QUANTITY THAT CORRESPONDS TO A REACTIVE RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOLLINGER, Franz Carl-Orff-Weg 8 82008 Unterhaching / DE | 02 /
SCHIMETTA, Gernot Sailerstrasse 18 80809 München / DE | [2002/49] | Application number, filing date | 01915084.6 | 06.03.2001 | [2002/49] | WO2001DE00846 | Priority number, date | DE2000110846 | 06.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10010846 | [2002/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0166367 | Date: | 13.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1261501 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1261501 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04, G01K7/34 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
B60C23/0408 (EP,US);
G01D5/48 (EP,US);
G01K7/34 (EP,US);
H03H9/6406 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/20] |
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ERZEUGNIS MIT EINEM SENSOR UND EINEM OBERFLÄCHENWELLENELEMENT SOWIE VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER EINEM REAKTIVEN WIDERSTAND ENTSPRECHENDEN MESSGRÖSSE EINES SENSORS | [2002/49] | English: | PRODUCT COMPRISING A SENSOR AND A SURFACE WAVE ELEMENT, AND METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING, FROM THE SENSOR, A MEASURED QUANTITY THAT CORRESPONDS TO A REACTIVE RESISTANCE | [2002/49] | French: | PRODUIT COMPRENANT UN CAPTEUR ET UN ELEMENT A ONDES DE SURFACE, AINSI QUE PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR DETERMINER UNE GRANDEUR DE MESURE D'UN CAPTEUR CORRESPONDANT A UNE RESISTANCE REACTIVE | [2002/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 28.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9745277 (BARTELS MANGOLD ELECTRONIC GMB [DE], et al) [A] 1,4,8,9,13 * page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 11, paragraph 5 - page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 17, paragraph 6 - page 18, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]JPS5917127 ; | [A]EP0883327 (AKO WERKE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,6-9,12,13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0450653 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1,9,13 * page 12, line 14 - line 19; figures 20-27 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840522), vol. 008, no. 109, Database accession no. (P - 275), & JP59017127 A 19840128 (NISSAN JIDOSHA KK) [A] 1,9,13 * abstract * |