|
26.11.2008 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
31.05.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Description |
Appeal |
18 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.02.2006 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
07.09.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.10.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2003 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2003 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2002 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2002 |
Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2002 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2001 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
26.10.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
42 |