|
28.07.2016 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2016 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2016 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Description |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
24.06.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2013 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
31 |
|
28.05.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
27.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2012 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.02.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2012 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
52 |
|
06.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2011 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
15 |
|
16.12.2011 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.07.2011 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2011 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
27.04.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
25.04.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
25.04.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
20.12.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
16.12.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
36 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
36 |
|
21.10.2008 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.09.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.07.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
29 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
19.05.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.05.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
80 |
|
18.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
18.12.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
12.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.04.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
37 |
|
21.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
47 |
|
21.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
21.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
21.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
71 |
|
29.06.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.04.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.01.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2005 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2005 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2005 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
15.09.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2003 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2003 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.09.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.09.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
13.09.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |