EP1265911 - 17-ALPHA-SUBSTITUTED-11-BETA-SUBSTITUTED-4-ARYL AND 21-SUBSTITUTED 19-NORPREGNADIENEDIONE AS ANTIPROGESTATIONAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES The National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [2008/21] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES c/o National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hyun, K. 6308 Marywood Road Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | 02 /
BLYE, Richard, P. 7352 Mink Hollow Road Highland, MD 20777 / US | 03 /
RAO, Pemmaraju, N. 4307 North Westberry Drive San Antonio, TX 78228 / US | 04 /
CESSAC, James, W. 11815 Vance Jackson, 602 San Antonio, TX 78230 / US | 05 /
ACOSTA, Carmie, K. 318 Addax San Antonio, TX 78213 / US | 06 /
SIMMONS, Anne, Marie 2032 West Mistletoe San Antonio, TX 78201 / US | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. Gray's Inn 14 South Square London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01918812.7 | 16.03.2001 | [2002/51] | WO2001US08681 | Priority number, date | US20000526855 | 17.03.2000 Original published format: US 526855 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0174840 | Date: | 11.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1265911 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1265911 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07J41/00, A61K31/57, C07J31/00, C07J7/00, C07J5/00, C07J9/00, A61K31/575, A61P5/36 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
C07J43/003 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/04 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
A61P5/36 (EP);
A61P5/44 (EP);
C07J31/006 (EP);
C07J41/0016 (EP);
C07J41/0083 (EP);
C07J5/0053 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 17-ALPHA-SUBSTITUIERTE-11-BETA-SUBSTITUIERTE-4-ARYL UND 21-SUBSTITUIERTE 19-NORPREGNADIENEDIONE MIT ANTIGESTAGENER AKTIVITÄT | [2002/51] | English: | 17-ALPHA-SUBSTITUTED-11-BETA-SUBSTITUTED-4-ARYL AND 21-SUBSTITUTED 19-NORPREGNADIENEDIONE AS ANTIPROGESTATIONAL AGENTS | [2002/51] | French: | MODIFICATION STRUCTURALE DE 19-NORPROGESTERONE I: 17-ALPHA-SUBSTITUE-11-BETA-SUBSTITUE-4-ARYLE ET 21-SUBSTITUE 19-NORPREGNADIENEDIONE EN TANT QUE NOUVEAUX AGENTS ANTIPROGESTATIFS | [2002/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 16.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 13.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08009259.6 / EP2033965 | EP10010646.7 / EP2348031 | EP10010647.5 / EP2348030 | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 13.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 13.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2007 | Decision despatched | 20.06.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 20.06.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.08.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2010/23] | deleted | ||
Former [2009/07] | SE | 21.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8912448 (RES TRIANGLE INST [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,49-60 * example 2 * * page 36; table 1 * * page 39; table 2 *; | [X]WO9741145 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,18,24,25,44,46,49-60 * examples I-XII * * page 50; table 1 * * figures 1-3, compounds 7A,7B, 8,9,11,16,39,27,37,45 * * page 3, lines 1-3 *; | [X]WO9945022 (RES TRIANGLE INST [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8,10-12,49-60 * page 28, lines 7,8,10,11,15,16; examples 1-3,5-7 * * pages 67-68; table 1 * * pages 69-70; table 2 * * pages 73-74; table 4 *; | [PX]WO0034306 (RES TRIANGLE INST [US]) [PX] 1-9,49-60* page 11, compounds 55-57; page 12, compounds 58-63; page 13, compounds 76-81; page 14, compounds 94-96; page 19, compound 181; page 20, compounds 182-186; page 47, paragraphs 2,5 *; | [XT] - RAO P N ET AL, "11beta-Substituted 13beta-ethyl gonane derivatives exhibit reversal of antiprogestational activity", STEROIDS: STRUCTURE, FUNCTION, AND REGULATION,US,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NEW YORK, NY, (1998), vol. 63, no. 1, ISSN 0039-128X, pages 50 - 57, XP004103060 [X] 1-3,6-8,10,49-60 * page 51, figure 1, compound CDB-2914; page 52, figure 2, compounds 12a and 13a; page 56; table 1 * [T] 1-3,6-8,49-60 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0039-128X(97)00119-0 | [X] - RAO P N ET AL, "New 11beta-aryl-substituted steroids exhibit both progestational and antiprogestational activity", STEROIDS: STRUCTURE, FUNCTION, AND REGULATION,US,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NEW YORK, NY, (19981001), vol. 63, no. 10, ISSN 0039-128X, pages 523 - 530, XP004140834 [X] 1-3,6-8,10,49-60 * page 528; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0039-128X(98)00060-9 |