EP1272664 - A METHOD OF CELL DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nofima Mat AS Osloveien 1 1430 Ås / NO | [2011/01] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states MATFORSK, NORWEGIAN FOOD RESEARCH INSTITUTE Osloveien 1 N-1320 Äs / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUDI, Knut Jonas Wessels vei 83 N-1540 Vestby / NO | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Rigby, Barbara Nicole, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Rigby, Barbara Nicole, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2003/02] | Gardner, Rebecca, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01919651.8 | 10.04.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001GB01619 | Priority number, date | GB20000008787 | 10.04.2000 Original published format: GB 0008787 | [2003/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0177379 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1272664 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/10, G01N33/50 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6876 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6809 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 06.11.2002 | LV | 06.11.2002 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 06.11.2002 | SI | 06.11.2002 | Title | German: | EIN VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION VON ZELLEN | [2003/02] | English: | A METHOD OF CELL DETECTION | [2003/02] | French: | DETECTION DE CELLULES | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/52] | 11.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5314805 (HAUGLAND RICHARD P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,14-16,20 * abstract * * column 7, line 13 - line 16; example 2; claims 1-20 *; | [X]EP0881489 (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,14-16,20 * abstract *; | [XY] - ROTH B L ET AL, "BACTERIAL VIABILITY AND ANTIBIOTIC SUSCEPTIBILITY TESTING WITH SYTOX GREEN NUCLEIC ACID STAIN", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON,DC, US, (1997), vol. 63, no. 6, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 2421 - 2431, XP000929110 [X] 1-8,12,16,19,20 * abstract * * page 2422, column 1, paragraph 5 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 2424, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 2428, column 2, paragraph 4; figures 2,4,5 * [Y] 14-18 | [X] - RIEDY M C ET AL, "USE OF A PHOTOLABELING TECHNIQUE TO IDENTIFY NONVIABLE CELLS IN FIXED HOMOLOGOUS OR HETEROLOGOUS CELL POPULATIONS", CYTOMETRY, ALAN LISS, NEW YORK, US, (1991), vol. 12, no. 2, ISSN 0196-4763, pages 133 - 139, XP001037495 [X] 1,2,7,8,14-18,20 * abstract * * page 136, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 138, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.990120206 | [X] - ORMEROD M G ET AL., "Quantification of apoptosis and necrosis by flow cytometry", ACTA ONCOLOGICA, (1993), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 417 - 424, XP008002042 [X] 1,2,7,8,15,16,18-20 * the whole document * | [X] - LANGSRUD S AND SUNDHEIM G, "Flow cytometry for rapid assessment of viability after exposure to a quaternary ammonium compound", JOURNAL OF APPLIED BACTERIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 81, pages 411 - 418, XP008002041 [X] 1,2,7,8,15,16,18,20 * the whole document * | [DY] - CIMINO G D ET AL, "POST-PCR STERILIZATION: A METHOD TO CONTROL CARRYOVER CONTAMINATIONFOR THE POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (19910111), vol. 19, no. 1, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 99 - 107, XP000471620 [DY] 14-18 * abstract * * page 100, column 2, paragraph 6 - page 101, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 102, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 5 * | [DA] - O'BRIEN M AND BOLTON W E, "Comparison of cell viability probes compatible with fixation and permeabilization for combined surface and intracellular staining in flow cytometry", CYTOMETRY, (1995), vol. 19, pages 243 - 255, XP001064602 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.990190308 | Examination | - ZHAO ET AL., "Comparison of cellular binding and uptake of antisense phosphodiester, phosphorothionate, and mixed phosphorothionate and methylphosphonate oligonucleotides", ANTISENSE RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, (1993), vol. 3, pages 53 - 66 |