EP1278935 - TUBING HEAD SEAL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2011 | Revocation of patent | published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC Technologies, Inc. 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago, IL 60601 / US | [2003/33] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states FMC CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTLETT, Christopher, D. 8506 Shadow Valley Lane Spring, TX 77388 / US | 02 /
CUNNINGHAM, Christopher, E. 3511 Walnut Forrest Court Spring, TX 77388 / US | 03 /
KENT, Richard, D. 2 Craigmill Cottages Newburgh, Fife KY14 6ER / GB | 04 /
GATHERAR, Nicholas 18 Juniper Avenue Juniper Green Midlothian EH14 5EE / GB | 05 /
HARROLD, David 12820 Greenwood Forest Houston, TX 77066 / US | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Musker, David Charles, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Musker, David Charles, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/05] | Hammler, Martin Franz, et al Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01920763.8 | 22.03.2001 | [2003/05] | WO2001US09606 | Priority number, date | US20000192124P | 24.03.2000 Original published format: US 192124 P | US20010268329P | 12.02.2001 Original published format: US 268329 P | [2003/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0173257 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1278935 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1278935 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/043, E21B33/04 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
E21B34/10 (EP,US);
B24B37/04 (EP,US);
B24B57/02 (EP,US);
E21B33/0355 (EP,US);
E21B33/04 (EP,US);
E21B33/043 (EP,US);
E21B33/064 (EP,US);
E21B34/04 (EP,US);
E21B43/013 (EP,US);
F16K3/02 (EP,US);
F16K3/0218 (EP,US);
F16K3/0254 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EINE TUBINGAUFHÄNGUNG | [2003/05] | English: | TUBING HEAD SEAL ASSEMBLY | [2003/05] | French: | ENSEMBLE JOINT D'ETANCHEITE DE TETE DE COLONNE DE PRODUCTION | [2003/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03008348.9 / EP1336721 | EP06075501.4 / EP1707737 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.2007
23.04.2007
ADMISSIBLE Vetco Gray UK Limited Broadfold Road Bridge of Don Industrial Estate Aberdeen AB23 8EY / GB Opponent's representative Lawson, Alison Christina, et al, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.2007
Vetco Gray UK Limited Broadfold Road Bridge of Don Industrial Estate Aberdeen AB23 8EY / GB Opponent's representative Lawson, Alison Christina, et al, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | 21.05.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.11.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.10.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 18.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 28.01.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 21.06.2006 | DE | 22.09.2006 | GB | 22.03.2009 | IT | 22.03.2009 | FR | 23.11.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2010/23] | NL | 21.06.2006 | |
DE | 22.09.2006 | ||
GB | 22.03.2009 | ||
FR | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | NL | 21.06.2006 | |
DE | 22.09.2006 | ||
FR | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2008/04] | NL | 21.06.2006 | |
DE | 22.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | IT | 21.06.2006 | |
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DE | 22.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 21.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0719905 (COOPER CAMERON CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 17-45; figures 4-6 *; | [A]US5544707 (HOPPER HANS P [GB], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 31 *; | [A]WO9704211 (EXPRO NORTH SEA LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph 7 - page 7, paragraph 1; figure 2 *; | [A]GB2321658 (VETCO GRAY INC ABB [US]) [A] * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 12 *; | [A]WO9904137 (AXTECH LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [DA]US5868204 (PRITCHETT MARTIN J [GB], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [PA]WO0047864 (FMC CORP [US], et al) [PA] 1* page 6, lines 17-25 *; | [PA]GB2347160 (FMC CORP [US]) [PA] 1 * page 2, line 12 - page E, line 19 * | by applicant | US5868204 | US6039119 |