|
22.03.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
15.03.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.04.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.11.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.09.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2003 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2002 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2002 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Refund of fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.03.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.10.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.09.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.09.2001 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
25 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Sequence listing |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.03.2001 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |