|
13.01.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
35 |
|
19.11.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.08.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
28.02.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.12.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.12.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.12.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.07.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.04.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.04.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2004 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
59 |