EP1267756 - SPEED-ADAPTIVE AND PATIENT-ADAPTIVE PROSTHETIC KNEE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139-4307 / US | [2007/25] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute Of Technology 77 Cambridge Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139-4307 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERR, Hugh, M. 69 Concord Avenue, 3 Somerville, MA 02143 / US | 02 /
WILKENFELD, Ari 259 Saint Paul Street Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 03 /
BLECK, Olaf 24 Breakwater Drive Chelsea, MA 02150 / US | [2003/10] |
Former [2003/01] | 01 /
HERR, Hugh, M. 69 Concord Avenue, 3 Somerville, MA 02143 / US | ||
02 /
WILKENFELD, Ari 259 Saint Paul Street Brookline, MA 02446 / US | |||
03 /
BLECK, Olaf 8 Spouting Horn Road Nahant, MA 01908 / US | Representative(s) | Hector, Annabel Mary, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Hector, Annabel Mary, et al D Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01923020.0 | 29.03.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001US10588 | Priority number, date | US20000192966P | 29.03.2000 Original published format: US 192966 P | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0172245 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1267756 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1267756 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/68 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
F16F9/535 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/64 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/1038 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/4528 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/68 (KR);
A61F2/70 (EP,US);
A61F2/74 (KR);
A61F2002/5003 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/5004 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/6818 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/704 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/7625 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHWINDIGKEITSANGEPASSTE UND PATIENTENANGEPASSTE KNIEPROTHESE | [2003/01] | English: | SPEED-ADAPTIVE AND PATIENT-ADAPTIVE PROSTHETIC KNEE | [2003/01] | French: | PROTHESE DE GENOU ADAPTABLE A LA VITESSE ET ADAPTABLE AU PATIENT | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 29.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07021281.6 / EP1880694 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.11.2007 | BE | 14.11.2007 | CH | 14.11.2007 | CY | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | LI | 14.11.2007 | NL | 14.11.2007 | TR | 14.11.2007 | GR | 15.02.2008 | ES | 25.02.2008 | LU | 29.03.2008 | IE | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
LU | 29.03.2008 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0549855 (BOCK ORTHOPAED IND [DE]) [A] 1-25 * abstract *; | [A]US5571205 (JAMES KELVIN B [CA]) [A] 1-25 * column 5, line 22 - line 44 *; | [A]WO9641599 (BOCK ORTHOPAED IND [DE], et al) [A] 1-25* abstract *; | [A]GB2328160 (BLATCHFORD & SONS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-25 * page 13, line 20 - page 21, line 25 *; | [A]US5888212 (PETROFSKY STEVEN H [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * column 3, line 32 - line 65 * |