|
19.06.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.07.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
113 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
113 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
06.08.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.07.2012 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2012 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.06.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
25.06.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2009 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2007 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.09.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.09.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2006 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.01.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.01.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.01.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.01.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.01.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.01.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.01.2004 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.05.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2002 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.11.2002 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2002 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.10.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.08.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.11.2001 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.11.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.11.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.10.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
127 |
|
15.08.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
19 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
79 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
28 |