|
25.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
27.04.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.09.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.01.2017 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.12.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Annex |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Statement of grounds |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2014 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2014 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.01.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
10.09.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.08.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.03.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2013 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2007 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
25.08.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.06.2005 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2004 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.08.2003 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2003 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2003 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.02.2003 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.11.2002 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2002 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2002 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.09.2002 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.10.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.09.2001 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
03.05.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.05.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
03.05.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
24 |