|
19.06.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.02.2012 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
9 |
|
16.01.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2011 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2011 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.11.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.10.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2011 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2010 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.12.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.12.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.10.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.06.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.02.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
06.02.2003 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2003 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
04.12.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2002 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.07.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.12.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.12.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.11.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
14.11.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.11.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
10.05.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.05.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
10.05.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
10.05.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |