|
10.09.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2010 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.09.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.09.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.09.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.06.2010 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
15.12.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.12.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.11.2008 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2008 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2008 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.05.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
15.05.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.03.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.12.2007 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.11.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.11.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.11.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.11.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.11.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Summons (notice) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.01.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.01.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
26 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
26 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2004 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.10.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2002 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.10.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Refund of fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.11.2001 |
Notification of defects in the demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.10.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.10.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
20.09.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
13.09.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.09.2001 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.05.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.05.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
11.05.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
08.03.2001 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
3 |