|
10.05.2023 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2023 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Minutes of the taking of evidence |
Opposition |
73 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
119 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.09.2022 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2022 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.09.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.09.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2022 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.2022 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.08.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.05.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2022 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2022 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2022 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Decision on the taking of evidence |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Decision on the taking of evidence |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Decision on the taking of evidence |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Decision on the taking of evidence |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Decision on the taking of evidence |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Decision on the taking of evidence |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
35 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
35 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
35 |
|
09.04.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.04.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.04.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
29.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.2021 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.2021 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2020 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.11.2020 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.11.2020 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
04.02.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2020 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2019 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2019 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.11.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.11.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.11.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.10.2019 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
12.09.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2019 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.07.2019 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2019 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2019 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2019 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2019 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2019 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.01.2019 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.01.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2018 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
05.12.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2018 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2018 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.02.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.02.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
08.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
18.07.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2015 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
10 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.07.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
13 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
29 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
29 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
29 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2012 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2012 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2012 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
21 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
89 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
98 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
29 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 014 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 015 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 016 |
Opposition |
15 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 017 |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
89 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
32 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
37 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.09.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.09.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.07.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.02.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.01.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.02.2003 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Refund of fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.12.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.12.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.12.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
05.12.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.12.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
22.11.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
15.11.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2001 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
19.06.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
22.05.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.05.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
22.05.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
20 |
|
22.05.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
12 |