|
23.06.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
31 |
|
31.10.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.10.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
26.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
13 |
|
05.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
02.03.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.12.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
15 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.07.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
21.05.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2009 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2003 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2003 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2003 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2003 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2003 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2002 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.05.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2002 |
Refund of fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.03.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.03.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.03.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.02.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.02.2002 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2001 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.11.2001 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
30.10.2001 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
30.10.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.10.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |