EP1279119 - GOAL SEEKING ENGINE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING CUSTOM MEDIA PRESENTATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D4 Media, Inc. 8001 Irvine Center Dr., Ste. 300 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2003/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNCOMBE, Jefferson 25444 Claveles Ct. Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Verhees, Godefridus Josephus Maria Brabants Octrooibureau De Pinckart 54 5674 CC Nuenen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Verhees, Godefridus Josephus Maria Brabants Octrooibureau, De Pinckart 54 5674 CC Nuenen / NL | Application number, filing date | 01928957.8 | 27.04.2001 | [2003/05] | WO2001US13733 | Priority number, date | US20000562244 | 28.04.2000 Original published format: US 562244 | US20000570326 | 12.05.2000 Original published format: US 570326 | US20000609476 | 30.06.2000 Original published format: US 609476 | US20000626866 | 27.07.2000 Original published format: US 626866 | [2003/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0184375 | Date: | 08.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1279119 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
G06F16/739 (EP,US);
G06F16/48 (US);
G06F16/78 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZIELSUCH-ENGINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG ANGEPASSTER MEDIENPRÄSENTATIONEN | [2003/05] | English: | GOAL SEEKING ENGINE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING CUSTOM MEDIA PRESENTATIONS | [2003/05] | French: | MOTEUR DE RECHERCHE D'OBJECTIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE GENERER DES PRESENTATIONS MEDIA PERSONNALISEES | [2003/05] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 17.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/17] | 05.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.02.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 02.02.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - MERIALDO B ET AL, "Automatic construction of personalized TV news programs", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA, ACM, NEW YORK, USA, (19991030), pages 323 - 331, XP002339571 [X] 1-12 * abstract * * pages 323-324, paragraph 1 * * page 325, paragraph 4 - page 328, paragraph 4.4 * | [A] - PACHET F ET AL, "A combinatorial approach to content-based music selection", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA COMPUTING AND SYSTEMS, FLORENCE, ITALY 7-11 JUNE 1999, IEEE COMPUTER SOC, US, (19990607), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7695-0253-9, pages 457 - 462, XP010342822 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMCS.1999.779245 | International search | [X]US5903892 (HOFFERT ERIC M [US], et al); | [X]US6012068 (BOEZEMAN JOHN J [US], et al) |