EP1279045 - TIME OF ARRIVAL ESTIMATION FOR POSITIONING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORCINO, Domenico, G. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2003/05] | White, Andrew Gordon, et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property, Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01929532.8 | 10.04.2001 | [2003/05] | WO2001EP04103 | Priority number, date | GB20000009830 | 25.04.2000 Original published format: GB 0009830 | [2003/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0181944 | Date: | 01.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1279045 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/14 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
G01S5/14 (EP,US);
H04B7/26 (KR);
H04W64/00 (KR);
G01S5/06 (EP,US);
G01S5/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHÄTZUNG DER ANKUNFTZEIT FÜR ORTUNGSSYSTEME | [2003/05] | English: | TIME OF ARRIVAL ESTIMATION FOR POSITIONING SYSTEMS | [2003/05] | French: | ESTIMATION DU TEMPS D'ARRIVEE POUR SYSTEMES DE POSITIONNEMENT | [2003/05] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 26.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 11.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5402450 (LENNEN GARY R [US]) [Y] 12 * column A; figures 13,15 * * column 11, line 37 - line 52 * * column 14, line 34 - line 46 *; | [A]US5608410 (STILP LOUIS A [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,9 * column A; figure 1 * * column 7, line 35 - line 53 ** column 21, line 47 - column 22, line 25 *; | [XY]US5890068 (FATTOUCHE MICHEL T [CA], et al) [X] 2,4,6,9 * column A; figures 3,11,12,15 * * column 6, line 53 - line 67 * * column 10, line 40 - column 11, line 21 * * column 12, line 8 - line 52 * * column 16, line 50 - line 53 * [Y] 1,3,5,7,10,12; | [Y]US5970414 (BI QI [US], et al) [Y] 1,5 * column A; figure 1 * * column 4, line 30 - line 43 *; | [YD] - RAPPAPORT T S ET AL, "POSITION LOCATION USING WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS ON HIGHWAYS OF THE FUTURE", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE,US,IEEE SERVICE CENTER. PISCATAWAY, N.J, (19961001), vol. 34, no. 10, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 33 - 41, XP000694477 [YD] 3,7,10 * Section "TDOA Algorithms for Position Location", page 38, left-hand column * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.544321 |