EP1293089 - FRAUD DETECTION BASED ON CALL ATTEMPT VELOCITY ON ORIGINATING NUMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MCI Worldcom, Inc. 515 East Amite Street Jackson, MS 39201 / US | [2003/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCHAND, Dean, C. 6251 E 122nd Avenue Brighton, CO 80601 / US | 02 /
JACKMAN, Erin, C. 3508 East 11th Avenue Denver, CO 80206 / US | [2003/17] |
Former [2003/12] | 01 /
MARCHAND, Dean, C. 6251 E 122nd Avenue Brighton, CO 80601 / US | ||
02 /
JACKMAN, Erin, C. 10 South Pennsylvania, 402 Denver, CO 80209 / US | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann, Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01933414.3 | 09.05.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001US40703 | Priority number, date | US20000575469 | 22.05.2000 Original published format: US 575469 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0191447 | Date: | 29.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1293089 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04M15/00, H04M3/00, H04M3/22, H04M15/10 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
H04M15/47 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0148 (EP,US);
H04M3/42059 (EP,US);
H04M3/4228 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/12] | H04M15/00, H04M3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BETRUGSERKENNUNG AUF DER GRUNDLAGE EINER ANRUFVERSUCHSGESCHWINDIGKEIT AN EINER URSPRUNGSNUMMER | [2003/12] | English: | FRAUD DETECTION BASED ON CALL ATTEMPT VELOCITY ON ORIGINATING NUMBER | [2003/12] | French: | DETECTION DE FRAUDES BASEE SUR LA VITESSE DE TENTATIVE D'APPEL D'UN NUMERO DE DEPART | [2003/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 20.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/16] | 10.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5602906 (PHELPS JAMES W [US]) [X] 1-23 * column 3, lines 20-42 * * column 4, lines 12-28 * * column 4, lines 42-65 * * column 6, lines 1-4 *; | [A]GB2307618 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * page 3, lines 11-14 * * page 6, lines 4-16 * * page 24, lines 10-19 *; | [A]US5970129 (ASFAR HOOSHMAND [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 6, lines 1-37 * * column 9, line 12 - column 10, line 10 * * column 14, lines 28-34 *; | [A]WO9913427 (MCI WORLDCOM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * page 7, lines 15-19 * * page 20, lines 3-14 * * page 20, lines 27-29 * * page 28, line 2 - page 29, line 20 * * page 32, line 13 - page 33, line 8 * * page 34, line 3 - page 36, line 6 * * page 37, lines 13-27 * * page 38, lines 10,11 * * page 44, lines 5-9 * * page 46, lines 11-13 * * page 49, lines 11-15 * | International search | [Y]US5875236 (JANKOWITZ CHARLES M [US], et al); | [Y]US5566234 (REED ELAINE E [US], et al); | [Y]EP0805580 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [Y]US5867566 (HOGAN STEVEN J [US], et al); | [YP]US6195422 (JONES DOUGLAS R [US], et al); | [YP]US6208720 (CURTIS TERRILL J [US], et al); | [Y]US5963625 (KAWECKI MICHAEL ANTHONY [US], et al) |