|
13.06.2014 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2014 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.05.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2014 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2014 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2014 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2014 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
18.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.2014 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
29 |
|
03.03.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.01.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2014 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
36 |
|
22.11.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
11 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.11.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.09.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
17 |
|
12.09.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.04.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
29.03.2011 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.03.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
48 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
48 |
|
23.09.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
07.07.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.06.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
30.05.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.05.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.05.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
37 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
08.05.2009 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.04.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
11 |
|
03.04.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
29 |
|
01.04.2008 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
27.09.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.09.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
52 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.04.2007 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.04.2007 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.04.2007 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
57 |
|
24.04.2007 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
31 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
55 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
19.06.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.05.2006 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
60 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
60 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2004 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.09.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.03.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.12.2002 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.11.2002 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.11.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.10.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
26.08.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.08.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.08.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
26.08.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
26.08.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.08.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.08.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
14.08.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.08.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
12.08.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
31.05.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.05.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.05.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
31.05.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
31.05.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
31.05.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
31.05.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.05.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.05.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.05.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/405 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/405 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.04.2002 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.04.2002 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.03.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.03.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.02.2002 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
15.01.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.01.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.12.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.06.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.06.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
11.06.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
26 |
|
11.06.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
8 |