|
26.08.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
27.02.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.01.2020 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2020 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
17.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.10.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
17.10.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2019 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2019 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.09.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2018 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2018 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.09.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
14.09.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
37 |
|
07.10.2016 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2016 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
08.04.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
19.11.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
19.11.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
19.11.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
19.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
04.09.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.08.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.06.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2015 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.06.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
24 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.09.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
20 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
37 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
43 |
|
09.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.01.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.08.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
27 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
60 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
26.04.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
21 |
|
09.03.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
57 |
|
09.03.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.01.2011 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
33 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2009 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
13.09.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
27.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
27.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.06.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.06.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.2002 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2002 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
15.06.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
11.06.2002 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
11.06.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
02.03.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.03.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
07.01.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.12.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
05.07.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.07.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
05.07.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
49 |
|
05.07.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |