|
20.01.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2010 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2010 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.2010 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
25.06.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.05.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2009 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2008 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
16 |
|
15.05.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Request for change of address |
Appeal |
7 |
|
16.02.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
86 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
105 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
95 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
05.02.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.11.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
24.10.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.10.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.10.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.10.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.10.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
24.10.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.08.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.08.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.08.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.01.2002 |
Notification of defects in the demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
07.01.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.11.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.11.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
12.07.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
6 |