|
11.05.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.02.2008 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2006 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2005 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.10.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.04.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2003 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2003 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2003 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2003 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.11.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
15.11.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
15.11.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
15.11.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.05.2002 |
Fax filed during the PCT2 procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.02.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.02.2002 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.02.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.02.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
05.01.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.01.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2002 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |