|
28.01.2011 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2011 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
16.11.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.10.2010 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.07.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
21.05.2010 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
05.05.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2006 |
Invitation to pay the shortfall after fee increase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2006 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2006 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2003 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2003 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Notification of submission or transmittal of priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.07.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |