EP1299942 - AMPLIFIER WITH OUTPUT TRANSFORMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAASKANT, Rob Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
NUIJTEN, Cornelis, P. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Schoenmaker, Maarten, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Schoenmaker, Maarten, et al Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 01953175.5 | 25.06.2001 | [2003/15] | WO2001EP07181 | Priority number, date | EP20000202281 | 30.06.2000 Original published format: EP 00202281 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0203547 | Date: | 10.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1299942 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/217, H03F3/26 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
H03F3/26 (EP,KR,US);
H03F3/217 (EP,KR,US);
H03F2201/3215 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKER MIT EINEM AUSGANGSTRANSFORMATOR | [2003/15] | English: | AMPLIFIER WITH OUTPUT TRANSFORMER | [2003/15] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR AVEC TRANSFORMATEUR DE SORTIE | [2003/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 14.09.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3743954 (SNEDKERUD O) [A] 2 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 8; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4028633 (ROGERS JIMMY DALE, et al) [Y] 1,4 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 16; figure 2 * * column 1, line 11 - line 32 *; | [A]US4047120 (LORD HAROLD WILBUR, et al) [A] 3* column 2, line 63 - column 6, line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5115205 (HOLMES JR CHARLES M [US]) [Y] 1,4 * column 1, line 16 - column 2, line 27; figure 1 * |