|
27.07.2017 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2017 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.2017 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.2017 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.02.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Opposition |
20 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2011 |
Request for transfer of rights - opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Request for transfer of rights - opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.09.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
10.09.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
10 |
|
03.09.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Request for transfer of rights - opponent |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.09.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.09.2010 |
Request for transfer of rights - opponent |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.08.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
13.03.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.12.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.07.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.06.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2003 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2003 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2002 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.03.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.02.2002 |
|
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Refund of fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.01.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.01.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.01.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.01.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
30.08.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.08.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.08.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
30.08.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |