EP1310071 - GENERATION OF A TRAINING SEQUENCE FOR PCM MODEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin, TX 78735 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin, Texas 78735 / US | ||
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAN, Lijun Daniel 3566 Copernicus Drive Mississauga, Ontario L5B 3L2 / CA | [2003/33] |
Former [2003/20] | 01 /
TAN, Lijun Daniel 3400 Riverspray Circle, Apartment 819 Mississauga, Ontario L4Y 3M5 / CA | Representative(s) | Wharmby, Martin Angus Freescale Semiconductor Inc. c/o Impetus IP Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Wharmby, Martin Angus Freescale Semiconductor Inc. c/o Impetus IP Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2003/20] | McCormack, Derek James, et al Motorola, European Intellectual Property Section, Law Department, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01959378.9 | 01.08.2001 | [2003/20] | WO2001US24064 | Priority number, date | US20000632890 | 07.08.2000 Original published format: US 632890 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0213475 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1310071 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/49 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
H04L25/4927 (EP,US);
H04L25/49 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2003/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG EINER TRAININGSFOLGE FÜR PCM-MODEMS | [2003/20] | English: | GENERATION OF A TRAINING SEQUENCE FOR PCM MODEMS | [2003/20] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA DETECTION ET LA COMPENSATION DE PERTES NUMERIQUES DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2003/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5825823 (GOLDSTEIN YURI [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * claim - *; | [A]EP0871303 (DEMJANENKO VICTOR [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0977410 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * claim - *; | [A]US5394437 (AYANOGLU ENDER [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 8, line 61 - column 11, line 11 *; | [A]WO0045524 (PCTEL INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * claim - *; | [A]WO0045534 (PCTEL INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * claim - *; | [A]WO0027058 (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * |