EP1316086 - COMBINING DTW AND HMM IN SPEAKER DEPENDENT AND INDEPENDENT MODES FOR SPEECH RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2003/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QI, Yingyong 6609 Maycrest Lane San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
BI, Ning 14209 Breezway Place San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 03 /
GARUDADRI, Harinath 9435 Oviedo Street San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01968568.4 | 05.09.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001US27625 | Priority number, date | US20000657760 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: US 657760 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0221513 | Date: | 14.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1316086 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1316086 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/26 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
G10L15/32 (EP,US);
G10L15/12 (EP,KR,US);
G10L15/14 (KR);
G10L15/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATION VON DIGITALER ZEITVERSCHIEBUNG UND HMM IN SPRECHERABHÄNGIGER- UND SPRECHERUNABHÄNGIGER WEISE FÜR DIE SPRACHERKENNUNG | [2003/23] | English: | COMBINING DTW AND HMM IN SPEAKER DEPENDENT AND INDEPENDENT MODES FOR SPEECH RECOGNITION | [2003/23] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE RECONNAISSANCE AUTOMATIQUE DE LA VOIX PAR MAPPAGE | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 04.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2006 | BE | 08.11.2006 | CH | 08.11.2006 | CY | 08.11.2006 | LI | 08.11.2006 | NL | 08.11.2006 | TR | 08.11.2006 | DK | 08.02.2007 | GR | 09.02.2007 | PT | 09.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
CY | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
GR | 09.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
GR | 09.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
NL | 08.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5734793 (WANG SHAY-PING T [US]) [Y] 2-8,28-32 * abstract * * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 12 *; | [Y]US5754978 (PEREZ-MENDEZ I [US], et al) [Y] 1-15,18-24,28-32 * abstract *; | [A]EP0955628 (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT]) [A] 1,6,8-10,18-20 * abstract *; | [E]WO0207148 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [E] 1-13,18-23,28-32* the whole document *; | [Y] - BOUCHAFFRA ET AL, "A METHODOLOGY FOR MAPPING SCORES TO PROBABILITIES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199909), vol. 21, no. 9, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 923 - 927, XP000851870 [Y] 1,9-15,18-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.790432 |