EP1344229 - A MAGNETORHEOLOGICAL FLUID COMPOSITION AND A PROCESS FOR PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Adviser Defence Research & Development Organisation, Ministry of Defence, Government of India B-148, Sena, DHQ P.O. New Delhi 110 011, Bhawan / IN | [2008/10] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states The Adviser Defence Research & Development Organisation, Ministry of Defence, Government of India B-148, Sena, DHQ P.O. New Delhi 110 011, Bhawan / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHN, Reji Naval Physical & Oceanographic Laboratory Thrikkakara PO., Kochi 682 021 / IN | 02 /
PILLAI, Narayana, Das, Janardhanan Naval Physical & Oceanographic Laboratory Thrikkakara PO., Kochi 682 021 / IN | [2008/10] |
Former [2003/38] | 01 /
JOHN, Reji Naval Physical & Oceanographic Laboratory Thrikkakara PO., Kochi 682 021 / IN | ||
02 /
PILLAI, Narayana, Das, Janardhanan Naval Physical & Oceanographic Labatory Thrikkakara PO., Kochi 682 021 / IN | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2003/38] | Petersen, Frank, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 11 08 47 76058 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 01976605.4 | 03.10.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001IN00167 | Priority number, date | IN9300DEL10 | 29.11.2000 Original published format: IN DE109300 | [2005/43] |
Former [2003/38] | IN20000109300 | 29.11.2000 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0245102 | Date: | 06.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1344229 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1344229 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/44 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
H01F1/447 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2003/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | MAGNETORHEOLOGISCHE FLUIDZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND PROZESS ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2003/38] | English: | A MAGNETORHEOLOGICAL FLUID COMPOSITION AND A PROCESS FOR PREPARATION THEREOF | [2003/38] | French: | COMPOSITION FLUIDIQUE MAGNETORHEOLOGIQUE ET PROCESSUS DE PREPARATION DE CETTE COMPOSITION | [2003/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 03.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4992190 (SHTARKMAN EMIL M [US]); | [A]US5534488 (HOFFMANN JAMES A [US]); | [A]US5578238 (WEISS KEITH D [US], et al); | [X]US6027664 (WEISS KEITH D [US], et al) |