|
17.09.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
11.09.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.04.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.12.2019 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.12.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2018 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2016 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2013 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.06.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.11.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.08.2007 |
Extension of time limit granted |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Extension of time limit granted |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Declaration that a search is not possible |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2006 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Priority document not received from IB during Euro-PCT phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
23.07.2003 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2003 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2003 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2003 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2003 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2003 |
Notice informing of designated offices |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2003 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.05.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
79 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
74 |