EP1240048 - ADJUSTER FOR A VEHICLE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEIPER GmbH & Co. KG Hertelsbrunnenring 2 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2003/21] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Keiper GmbH & Co. Hertelsbrunnenring 2 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÄNSEL, Richard Am Alzeyer Tor 10 55237 Flonheim / DE | 02 /
RUETH, Andreas Konrad-Adenauer-Str. 21 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held Klopstockstrasse 63-65 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held Klopstockstrasse 63 70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01980494.7 | 17.10.2001 | [2002/38] | WO2001EP12000 | Priority number, date | DE2000152092 | 20.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10052092 | [2002/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0234564 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1240048 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1240048 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/235 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
B60N2/2352 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2002/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | EINSTELLER FÜR EINEN FAHRZEUGSITZ | [2002/38] | English: | ADJUSTER FOR A VEHICLE SEAT | [2002/38] | French: | ELEMENT DE REGLAGE DESTINE A UN SIEGE DE VEHICULE | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 28.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4146267 (MORI MAMORU, et al) [X] 1-4,8 * column A; figure 3 *; | [X]JPH01218407 (TACHI S CO) [X] 1-4,8 * figure 9 *; | [X]EP0506580 (FUJI KIKO KK [JP]) [X] 1-6,8 * column 4, line 32 - line 38; figure 2 *; | [X]US5340196 (IKEGAYA ISAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,8 * column 13, line 53 - column 14, line 28; figure 25 *; | [A]FR2730960 (TACHI S CO [JP]) [A] 1-4,8* page 9, line 14 - page 10, line 3; figure 2A *; | [X]EP0776781 (FUJI KIKO KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,8 * column 5, line 21 - line 25; figure 2 * |