EP1335167 - AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2006/20] |
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMODA, Junichi Daikin Industries, Ltd Kanaoko-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | [2006/20] |
Former [2003/33] | 01 /
SHIMODA, J. Daikin Industries, Ltd Kanaoko-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | Representative(s) | Zinnecker, Armin Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zinnecker, Armin Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01981104.1 | 13.11.2001 | [2003/33] | WO2001JP09927 | Priority number, date | JP20000345580 | 13.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000345580 | [2003/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0239025 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1335167 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1335167 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/02, F25B13/00, F24F11/00 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP,US);
F24F11/46 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/30 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/62 (EP,KR,US);
F24F2110/10 (EP,US);
F24F2110/12 (EP,KR,US);
F24F2110/40 (KR);
F24F2140/12 (EP,US);
F24F2140/20 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2313/005 (EP,US);
F25B2313/0233 (EP,US);
F25B2313/0314 (EP,US);
F25B2313/0315 (EP,US);
F25B2400/075 (EP,US);
F25B2400/16 (EP,US);
F25B2700/1931 (EP,US);
F25B2700/1933 (EP,US);
F25B2700/2106 (EP,US);
F25B49/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/33] | F24F11/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE | [2003/33] | English: | AIR CONDITIONER | [2003/33] | French: | CONDITIONNEUR D'AIR | [2003/33] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2002 | Translation filed | 16.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/37] | IT | 17.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03271665 ; | [X]JPH0257875 ; | [Y]JPH06109311 ; | [XY]EP0692683 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-10 * page 1, line 23 - page 1, line 56 * * page 9, line 40 - page 12, line 59 * [Y] 3,4 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920305), vol. 016, no. 090, Database accession no. (M - 1218), & JP03271665 A 19911203 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900515), vol. 014, no. 228, Database accession no. (M - 0973), & JP02057875 A 19900227 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940722), vol. 018, no. 393, Database accession no. (M - 1643), & JP06109311 A 19940419 (YAMATAKE HONEYWELL CO LTD) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH0593540 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH06109311 (YAMATAKE HONEYWELL CO LTD); | [Y]JPH08219530 (DAIKIN IND LTD) |