EP1329044 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION ABOUT A BROADCAST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048-5343 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EATON, Eric, Thomas 3198 Medinah Circle East Lake Worth, FL 33467 / US | 02 /
SIBECAS, Salvador 7181 Lockwood Rd. Lake Worth, FL 33467 / US | 03 /
LAMB, James, A. 11528 Northwest 20th Drive Coral Springs, FL 33071 / US | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/49] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2003/30] | Litchfield, Laura Marie Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint - Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01981380.7 | 31.07.2001 | [2003/30] | WO2001US31173 | Priority number, date | US20000630326 | 31.07.2000 Original published format: US 630326 | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0211330 | Date: | 07.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1329044 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00, H04H7/00, H04H9/00, H04N7/00, H04N7/14 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
G08B5/229 (EP,US);
H04H20/93 (EP,US);
H04H60/13 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US);
H04N21/436 (EP,US);
H04N21/4524 (EP,US);
H04N21/458 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N21/8586 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W88/023 (EP,US);
H04H2201/40 (EP,US);
H04L12/189 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/478 (EP,US);
H04N5/38 (EP,US);
H04W4/00 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG ZUSÄTZLICHER INFORMATIONEN ÜBER EINE RUNDSENDUNG | [2003/30] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION ABOUT A BROADCAST | [2003/30] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR FOURNIR DES INFORMATIONS SUPPLEMENTAIRES RELATIVES A UNE EMISSION | [2003/30] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 13.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/47] | 17.10.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.10.2012 | 23.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 28.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.11.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5382970 (KIEFL JOHN B [CA]) [A] 1,4,6 * column 6, line 27 - line 58 * * column 8, line 10 - line 47 *; | [AX]EP0713335 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-5,7 * column 3, line 14 - line 25 * * column 4, line 2 - line 13 * * column 5, line 33 - line 47 * * column 6, line 12 - line 14 * * column 8, line 10 - line 20 * * column 10, line 9 - line 12 * * column 10, line 18 - line 33 * * column 10, line 44 - column 11, line 5 * * column 11, line 33 - line 44 * * figure 2 * [X] 6; | [A]US5812931 (YUEN HENRY C [US]) [A] 1,3,4,6* column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 33 *; | [PX]US6167235 (SIBECAS SALVADOR [US], et al) [PX] 6 * column 7, line 18 - line 26 * * column 8, line 2 - line 8 * * column 8, line 11 - line 13 * * column 8, line 28 - line 51 * | International search | [Y]US5812931 (YUEN HENRY C [US]); | [Y]US6005490 (HIGASHIHARA MORIO [JP]) | Examination | EP0259717 | US5973685 | by applicant | EP0713335 | JPH1141566 |