|
20.09.2018 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.09.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
12.09.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2018 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.04.2018 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
13.04.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2018 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
28 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.11.2002 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.11.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
25.09.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
25.09.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.08.2002 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.08.2002 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
31.08.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
25.06.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.06.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.06.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.05.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
13.05.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
06.05.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |